+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Creagan, Eli, Holt, Nakamura, Quinlan excused (6).
- Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1721), recommending referral to FIN.
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Ichiyama, Kitagawa, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Quinlan.
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Resolution re-scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-19-19 9:35AM in conference room 309.
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-19-19 9:00AM in conference room 309.
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 33
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Offered
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- To be offered.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor