+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
- Reported from EDB/VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1638-18), recommending referral to FIN.
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) LoPresti, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Ito, Tokioka, Ward.
- The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Keohokalole, Holt, Ichiyama, Johanson, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Matsumoto.
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDB/VMI on Wednesday, 03-21-18 10:26AM in conference room 309.
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to EDB/VMI, FIN, referral sheet 39
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Offered
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- To be offered.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor