+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
- Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1798) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN.
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Say.
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 03-21-19 8:30AM in conference room 329.
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 33
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Offered
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- To be offered.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor