+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Resolution adopted in final form.
- Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Holt, McKelvey excused (4).
- Reported from PVM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1776), recommending adoption.
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on PVM recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Gates, D. Kobayashi, Kong, Nishimoto, Ohno, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by PVM on Wednesday, 03-20-19 11:00AM in conference room 430.
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to PVM, referral sheet 33
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Offered
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- To be offered.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor