+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Resolution adopted in final form.
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 392).
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to House.
- Adopted.
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Deferred until 03-05-13.
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Deferred until 03-01-13.
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Deferred until 02-20-13.
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Deferred until 02-14-13.
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Deferred until 02-13-13.
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Deferred until 02-12-13.
On February 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Deferred until 02-11-13.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 13).
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate.
- Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Har excused (2).
- Offered
- To be offered.
+ − Sponsors (48)
Type:
Primary Sponsor