+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM, WAM.
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 402).
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate.
- Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Hashem excused (2).
- Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1351-14), recommending adoption.
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takai, Ito, Awana, Brower, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Tsuji, Wooley; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by VMI on Wednesday, 03-12-14 8:30AM in conference room 312.
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to VMI, referral sheet 23
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Offered
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- To be offered.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor