+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
- Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1593-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN.
On March 23, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Kong, McKelvey, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cullen, C. Lee, Lowen.
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 03-23-18 10:30AM in conference room 325.
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 31
- Offered
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- To be offered.