+ − Actions (7)
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- Re-referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 32
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by HUS on Tuesday, 03-22-16 10:00AM in conference room 329.
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to HUS, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 27
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Offered
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- To be offered.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor