+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- The committee(s) on HSH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by HSH on Friday, 03-22-19 8:30AM in conference room 329.
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to HSH, FIN, referral sheet 33
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Offered
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- To be offered.