+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 46
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on OMH with Representative(s) Awana, Hanohano, Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Lowen, Souki, Takai, Wooley excused (4).
- Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1088-14), recommending referral to OMH.
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Cullen, Kawakami, Nishimoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Hanohano, C. Lee, Say, Fale.
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Monday, 03-17-14 8:00AM in House conference room 325.
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Friday 03-14-14 9:45AM in conference room 325.
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 03-14-14 9:45AM in conference room 325.
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to WAL, OMH, FIN, referral sheet 20
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Offered
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- To be offered.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor