+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received notice of Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 631).
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- Resolution adopted in final form.
- Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Nakamura, Tokioka excused (4).
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received notice of House agreement (Hse. Com. No. 622)
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Deferred one day 04-23-21.
- House agrees to Senate amendment(s).
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 797) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-16-21.
- Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1740) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English.
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 04-08-21 3:00PM; CR 224 & Videoconference.
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 342).
- Referred to TRS.
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate.
- Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ohno excused (2).
- Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1614) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption.
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Takumi, Todd, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti, Nakamura.
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by JHA on Monday, 03-29-21 2:00PM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
- Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1145), recommending referral to JHA.
On March 19, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Ilagan, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, Nakamura, Takumi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 03-19-21 10:30AM in conference room 423 Via Videoconference.
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to TRN, JHA, referral sheet 15
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Offered
On February 12, 2021 in the House:
- To be offered.