+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Resolution adopted in final form.
- Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Oshiro, Thielen, Tupola excused (4).
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1522-16), recommending adoption.
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola, Jordan.
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On April 1, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-05-16 2:00PM in conference room 308.
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Ing, Kong, Luke, Saiki, Thielen, Tokioka excused (7).
- Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1366-16), recommending referral to FIN.
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, Ichiyama, Ito, Say, Tsuji, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Choy, Ing, Kong, Tupola.
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 03-23-16 2:00PM in conference room 309.
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 27
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Offered
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- To be offered.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor