+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, McKelvey, Oshiro, Rhoads, Thielen, Ward excused (6).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1456-16), recommending referral to FIN.
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami, C. Lee, Thielen.
On March 28, 2016 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-31-16 2:01PM in conference room 325.
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Oshiro, Tokioka, Tupola, Woodson excused (6).
- Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1329-16), recommending referral to JUD.
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Ito, Tokioka, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Onishi, Tsuji, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Kawakami, Kong, Ohno, Woodson.
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by VMI on Monday, 03-21-16 9:00AM in House conference room 312.
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to VMI, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Offered
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- To be offered.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor