+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received notice of Agreement and Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 697).
On April 27, 2018 in the House:
- Resolution adopted in final form.
- Adopted as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Thielen, Tupola excused (3).
- House agrees to Senate amendment(s).
On April 23, 2018 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 820) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
- Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3806) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
On April 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Inouye; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere, L. Thielen.
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 04-16-18 1:30PM in conference room 224.
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to WTL.
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 421).
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1790-18), recommending adoption.
- Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Choy, Fukumoto, Holt, C. Lee, McKelvey excused (5).
- Transmitted to Senate.
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Tupola, Ward.
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-03-18 10:05AM in conference room 308.
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
- Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1642-18), recommending referral to FIN.
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) DeCoite, Creagan, Say, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, Gates.
On March 16, 2018 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by OMH on Tuesday, 03-20-18 11:15AM in conference room 312.
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Re-referred to OMH, FIN, referral sheet 37
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to OMH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 31
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Offered
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- To be offered.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor