+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, Fukumoto Chang, Hashem, Luke, Souki, Tokioka, Ward excused (7).
- Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 914), recommending referral to FIN.
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Choy, DeCoite, Ito, Onishi, Tokioka, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Cachola, Ohno, Woodson, Matsumoto, Ward.
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDB on Friday, 03-13-15 9:15AM in conference room 312.
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 28
- Offered
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- To be offered.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor