+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (24)
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- Resolution adopted in final form.
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 687).
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-17-14.
- Reported from TEC/PSM/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3425) with recommendation of adoption.
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TEC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Tokuda.
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Green.
- The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Nishihara.
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TEC/PSM/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 04-14-14 9:45AM in conference room 414.
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to TEC/PSM/CPN.
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 438).
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1407-14), recommending adoption.
- Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Oshiro, Say excused (4).
- Transmitted to Senate.
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Evans, Ito, C. Lee, Nakashima, Oshiro, Tsuji, Yamane, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola, Har.
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-02-14 2:05PM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-02-14 at 2:00pm.
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Resolution re-scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-31-14 2:10PM in conference room 325.
- Re-referred to CPC, referral sheet 43
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-31-14 2:00PM in conference room 325.
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 16
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Offered
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- To be offered.