+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on WAL as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Ichiyama excused (2).
- Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1083) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to WAL.
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Nakamura, Hashem, Quinlan, San Buenaventura; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, McDermott.
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 02-28-17 10:30AM in conference room 423.
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to HSG, WAL, referral sheet 16
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Offered
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- To be offered.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor