+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 5, 2023 in the House:
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1985), recommending adoption.
- Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Yamashita excused (2).
- Resolution adopted in final form.
On April 3, 2023 in the House:
- The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 31, 2023 in the House:
- Scheduled for decision making on Monday, 04-03-23 2:00PM in conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
On March 30, 2023 in the House:
- Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1713) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN.
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ilagan, Sayama, Woodson excused (3).
On March 28, 2023 in the House:
- The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Hashem, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On March 23, 2023 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 03-28-23 9:30AM in conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
On March 10, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 18
On March 2, 2023 in the House:
- Offered
On March 1, 2023 in the House:
- To be offered.