+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Resolution adopted in final form.
- Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ohno excused (2).
- Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1613) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption.
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Takumi, Todd, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti, Nakamura.
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by JHA on Monday, 03-29-21 2:00PM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
- Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1144), recommending referral to JHA.
On March 19, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Ilagan, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, Nakamura, Takumi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 03-19-21 10:30AM in conference room 423 Via Videoconference.
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to TRN, JHA, referral sheet 15
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Offered
On February 12, 2021 in the House:
- To be offered.