+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 23, 2018 in the House:
- Resolution adopted in final form.
- Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, McKelvey, Mizuno, Souki, Tokioka excused (7).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1514-18), recommending adoption.
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Brower, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, Morikawa, McDermott.
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 03-21-18 3:00PM in conference room 325.
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and Representative(s) Gates, McDermott, Quinlan, Thielen excused (4).
- Reported from PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1139-18), recommending referral to JUD.
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Gates, Creagan; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Thielen.
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Resolution re-scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 03-08-18 9:30AM in conference room 329.
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 03-08-18 9:30AM in House conference room 429.
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to PBS, JUD, referral sheet 31
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Offered
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- To be offered.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor