+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On June 30, 2020 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Perruso, Thielen, Wildberger voting no (3) and Representative(s) Har, McDermott, Say excused (3).
- Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1238-20), recommending referral to FIN.
On June 29, 2020 in the House:
- The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Tarnas; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Wildberger; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Lowen, Ward.
On June 25, 2020 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by WLH on Monday, 06-29-20 11:00AM in conference room 325.
On March 16, 2020 in the House:
- This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 03-18-20 10:00AM in conference room 325.
On March 13, 2020 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by WLH on Wednesday, 03-18-20 10:00AM in conference room 325.
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 39
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Offered
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- To be offered.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor