+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On May 5, 2017 in the House:
- Resolution adopted in final form.
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 723).
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-27-17.
- Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1738) with recommendation of adoption.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, K. Kahele, Dela Cruz; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Riviere.
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 04-24-17 2:45PM in conference room 329.
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to EDU.
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to EDU, WAM.
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 405).
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1596), recommending adoption.
- Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
- Transmitted to Senate.
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Quinlan, Ward.
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-04-17 10:35AM in conference room 308.
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
- Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1411), recommending referral to FIN.
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Har, Creagan, Hashem, Ohno, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, McKelvey.
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 03-22-17 3:00PM in conference room 309.
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 14
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Offered
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- To be offered.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (50)
Type:
Primary Sponsor