+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM/WAM.
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 502).
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate.
- Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Oshiro, Say excused (4).
- Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1428-14), recommending adoption.
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Takai, Ito, Awana, Cachola, Onishi, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Choy, Ohno, McDermott, Wooley.
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by VMI on Wednesday, 04-02-14 8:30AM in conference room 312.
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Re-referred to VMI, referral sheet 35
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to VMI, FIN, referral sheet 34
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- Offered
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor