+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Ing, Kong, Luke, Saiki, Thielen, Tokioka excused (7).
- Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1425-16), recommending referral to FIN.
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Oshiro, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Jordan, Tupola.
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 03-24-16 10:15AM in conference room 329.
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 23
- Offered
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- To be offered.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor