+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
- Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1735-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN.
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Belatti, Learmont, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by HHS on Thursday, 03-08-18 9:30AM in House conference room 312.
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to HHS, FIN, referral sheet 19
- Offered
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- To be offered.