+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 46
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- The committee(s) on OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-19-14 9:30AM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-19-14 at 9:30AM.
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by OMH on Wednesday, 03-12-14 9:00AM in House conference room 325.
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Re-referred to OMH, FIN, referral sheet 28
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to WAL/OMH, FIN, referral sheet 9
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Offered
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- To be offered.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor