+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to HTH/TIA/WTL.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 652).
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate.
- Adopted as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Har, McDermott, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (4).
- Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1688) as amended in HD 2, recommending adoption.
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Kobayashi, Woodson, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Jordan.
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-11-13, 11:45am.
- Scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-11-13 11:55AM in conference room 329.
- Resolution re-scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-11-13 11:45AM in conference room 329.
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 04-10-13 8:30AM in conference room 329.
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on HLT as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, McKelvey excused (2).
- Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1288) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to HLT.
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Ichiyama, Aquino, Hashem, Ing, Nakashima, Takumi, Yamashita, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by TRN on Monday, 03-25-13 11:15AM in conference room 309.
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to TRN, HLT, referral sheet 12
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Offered
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- To be offered.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor