+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
- Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1601-18), recommending referral to FIN.
On March 23, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Kong, Lowen, McKelvey, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cullen, C. Lee.
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 03-23-18 10:30AM in conference room 325.
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 39
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Offered