+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Resolution adopted in final form.
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 688).
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-28-15.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1697) with recommendation of adoption.
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Chun Oakland, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi, Dela Cruz, Galuteria.
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-23-15 9:05AM in conference room 211.
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to WAM.
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to AGL/HWN, WAM.
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1460), recommending adoption.
- Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1).
- Transmitted to Senate.
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 425).
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-07-15 2:15PM in conference room 308.
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Har, Ing, Takumi excused (3).
- Reported from AGR/EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1055), recommending referral to FIN.
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Brower, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Ohno, Onishi, Tokioka, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Ito, Woodson, Matsumoto, Ward.
- The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Onishi, Brower, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Kawakami, Kong, Ohno, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Ito, Woodson, Matsumoto, Ward.
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by AGR/EDB on Thursday, 03-19-15 9:30AM in House conference room 312.
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to AGR/EDB, FIN, referral sheet 33
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Offered
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (19)
DECOITE
Type:
Primary Sponsor