+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Resolution adopted in final form.
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 932).
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
- Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2222) with recommendation of adoption.
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang, J.Keohokalole.
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 04-16-19 9:05AM in conference room 229.
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to CPH.
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to LCA.
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 631).
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2047), recommending adoption.
- Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Quinlan excused (2).
- Transmitted to Senate.
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan.
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 04-03-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
- Reported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1891), recommending referral to JUD.
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Nakamura, Belatti, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by HSH on Friday, 03-22-19 8:30AM in conference room 329.
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to HSH, JUD, referral sheet 33
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- Offered
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor