+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- The committee(s) on TOU recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by TOU on Monday, 03-18-13 9:35AM in conference room 312.
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to TOU, VMI, referral sheet 20
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Offered
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- To be offered.