+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Oshiro, Tokioka excused (2).
- Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1324), recommending referral to FIN.
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Cullen, Evans, C. Lee, Lowen, Nishimoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, Say, Pouha.
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 03-27-15 10:00AM in conference room 325.
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on WAL with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Cullen, Ward excused (3).
- Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 997), recommending referral to WAL.
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Brower, Cachola, DeCoite, Ohno, Onishi, Tokioka, Tsuji, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Choy, Ito, Ward.
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDB on Friday, 03-20-15 10:30AM in conference room 312.
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to EDB, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 33
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Offered
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor