+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Creagan, Eli, Holt, Nakamura, Quinlan excused (6).
- Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1707), recommending referral to FIN.
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Har, Tarnas, Todd, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Yamane.
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-19-19 9:30AM in conference room 325.
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 33
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- Offered
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor