+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
- Reported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1871) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN.
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakamura, Belatti, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Ward.
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by HSH on Wednesday, 03-27-19 8:30AM in conference room 329.
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Re-referred to HSH, FIN, referral sheet 39
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to HSH/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 33
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- Offered
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor