+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received notice of Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 663).
On April 27, 2016 in the House:
- Resolution adopted in final form.
- Adopted as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
- House agrees to Senate amendment(s).
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 666) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-20-16.
- Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3653) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
On April 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Chun Oakland, K.Kahele, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Dela Cruz, Slom.
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 04-15-16 1:30PM in conference room 229.
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to EDU.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 459).
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate.
- Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Oshiro, Thielen, Tupola excused (4).
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1556-16), recommending adoption.
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On April 1, 2016 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-05-16 2:15PM in House conference room 308.
On March 28, 2016 in the House:
- Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 37
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 28
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Offered
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor