+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Resolution adopted in final form.
- Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and McKelvey excused (1).
- Reported from LMG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1300), recommending adoption.
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on LMG recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, Mizuno, Awana, Cachola, McKelvey, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Saiki.
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by LMG on Thursday, 03-21-13 2:00PM in House conference room 423.
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to LMG, referral sheet 20
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Offered
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- To be offered.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor