+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Ing, Kong, Luke, Saiki, Thielen, Tokioka excused (7).
- Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1392-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN.
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Cullen, Evans, C. Lee, Lowen, Nishimoto, Say, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, Pouha.
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Monday, 03-21-16 10:00AM in House conference room 325.
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 28
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Offered
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor