+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
- Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1531), recommending referral to FIN.
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ito, Tokioka, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward.
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by VMI on Thursday, 03-23-17 9:50AM in conference room 429.
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to VMI, FIN, referral sheet 30
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Offered