+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Resolution adopted in final form.
- Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Har, McDermott, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (4).
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1668), recommending adoption.
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa.
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-10-13 3:00PM in conference room 308.
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to FIN, referral sheet 40
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Offered
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor