+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received notice of Agreement and Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 720).
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Resolution adopted in final form.
- Resolution adopted in final form.
- Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Wooley excused (2).
- House agrees to Senate amendment(s).
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 428) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-02-14.
- Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3171) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Chun Oakland, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara.
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-14 1:40PM in conference room 229.
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to HTH.
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 387).
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate.
- Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, Say, Tokioka, Yamashita excused (4).
- Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 979-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption.
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Creagan, Hashem, Kobayashi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Jordan, Oshiro, Woodson.
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled for decision making on Friday, 03-07-14 9:35AM in conference room 329.
- The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-07-14 at 9:35AM.
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-05-14 8:30AM in conference room 329.
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-05-14 at 8:30AM.
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 02-26-14 10:00AM in House conference room 329.
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, referral sheet 9
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Offered
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- To be offered.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor