+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
- Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1605-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN.
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Quinlan, Brower, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem.
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 03-21-18 9:45AM in House conference room 423.
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 39
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Offered