+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received notice of Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 644).
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Adopted as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, Tupola excused (2).
- House agrees to Senate amendment(s).
- Resolution adopted in final form.
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 682) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-19-17.
- Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1612) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
On April 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Kidani, Ruderman.
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 04-12-17 9:00AM in conference room 229.
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 449).
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1646), recommending adoption.
- Transmitted to Senate.
- Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro, Saiki, Ward excused (3).
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Aquino, Ito, Takayama, Todd, Yamane, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Say.
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 04-05-17 2:00PM in conference room 329.
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
- Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1427), recommending referral to CPC.
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Kobayashi, Har, Morikawa, Oshiro, Todd, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On March 18, 2017 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 03-21-17 10:30AM in conference room 329.
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 30
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Offered