+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, referred to WAM.
- Reported from TEC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1615), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TEC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Nishihara, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Slom.
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TEC has scheduled a public hearing on 04-16-13 1:20PM in conference room 414.
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to TEC, WAM.
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 384).
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate.
- Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Coffman, Hanohano voting no (2) and Representative(s) Belatti, Ito, C. Lee, Tokioka excused (4).
- Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1270), recommending adoption.
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Re-referred to WAL, referral sheet 44
- The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Fale; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Hanohano, Kawakami; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Coffman; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cullen, C. Lee, Thielen.
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Monday, 03-25-13 9:00AM in conference room 325.
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to WAL, VMI, referral sheet 39
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Offered