+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to THA/WAM.
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 643).
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate.
- Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Har, Oshiro excused (2).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1630), recommending adoption.
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Har, Belatti, Ito, C. Lee, Tsuji, Wooley, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Cabanilla, Carroll, Kawakami, McDermott.
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 04-05-13 2:00PM in conference room 325.
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Kawakami, McKelvey excused (2).
- Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1281), recommending referral to JUD.
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Cullen, Coffman, Evans, Lowen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami, C. Lee, Fale.
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Resolution re-scheduled to be heard by OMH on Wednesday, 03-27-13 11:00AM in conference room 325.
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by OMH on Wednesday, 03-27-13 9:30AM in conference room 325.
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to OMH, JUD, referral sheet 39
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Offered
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor