+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- The committee(s) on OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by OMH on Wednesday, 03-25-15 at 9:00 am in conference room 325.
- This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 03-25-15 at 9:00 am in conference room 325.
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Proposed draft of Resolution scheduled to be heard by OMH on Wednesday, 03-25-15 9:00AM in conference room 325. Copy of proposed draft available at www.capitol.hawaii.gov.
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to OMH, JUD, referral sheet 33
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Offered
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor