+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
- Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1743-18), recommending referral to FIN.
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Belatti, Learmont, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by HHS on Thursday, 03-22-18 9:00AM in conference room 329.
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Re-referred to HHS, FIN, referral sheet 39
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to HHS/EDN, FIN, referral sheet 18
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- Offered
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- To be offered.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor