+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Souki, Thielen excused (7).
- Reported from HSG/WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1383), recommending referral to FIN.
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Kong, Cullen, Evans, C. Lee, Lowen, Say; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Fukumoto.
- The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Nakamura, Aquino, Hashem, Quinlan, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) San Buenaventura; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by HSG/WAL on Tuesday, 03-21-17 10:30AM in conference room 423.
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to HSG/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 14
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Offered
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- To be offered.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor