+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On May 5, 2017 in the House:
- Resolution adopted in final form.
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 720).
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-26-17.
- Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1726) with recommendation of adoption.
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, L. Thielen.
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-21-17 8:00AM in conference room 312.
- Re-Referred to PSM.
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM/JDL, WAM.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 448).
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1657), recommending adoption.
- Transmitted to Senate.
- Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro, Saiki, Ward excused (3).
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Brower, Johanson, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Oshiro.
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 04-04-17 2:15PM in conference room 325.
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
- Reported from PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1399), recommending referral to JUD.
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, LoPresti, Creagan, DeCoite, Gates, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ing.
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 03-23-17 10:00AM in conference room 312.
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to PBS, JUD, referral sheet 30
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Offered
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor