+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to HWN/PSM, WAM.
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 478).
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate.
- Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Oshiro, Say excused (4).
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1488-14), recommending adoption.
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Woodson.
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-02-14 3:35PM in conference room 308.
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Yamane excused (2).
- Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1263-14), recommending referral to FIN.
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Cullen, Evans, Kawakami, C. Lee, Lowen, Say, Nishimoto, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by OMH on Wednesday, 03-19-14 9:45AM in conference room 325.
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to OMH, FIN, referral sheet 33
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- Offered
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor