+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
- Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1476), recommending referral to FIN.
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Keohokalole, Nakashima, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-23-17 10:00AM in House conference room 309.
- The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-23-17 at 10:00 AM.
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-21-17 10:40AM in conference room 309.
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 30
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Offered